AK HB106 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN5: (GOV/FUND TRANSFERS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN5: (GOV/FUND TRANSFERS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act allowing appropriations to the civil legal services fund from court filing fees.
Title
Civil Legal Services Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | FN5: (GOV/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2018-05-12 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-12 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 |
2018-05-12 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-12 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-12 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 106(FIN) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, BISHOP, BEGICH, EGAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 106(FIN) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-12 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FN5: (GOV/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FN4: (CED) |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-05-04 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2018-02-14 | House | RETURNED TO SENATE |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL REPRINTED 2/14/18 |
2018-02-14 | House | PRIME SPONSOR: CLAMAN |
2018-02-14 | House | BILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE |
2018-02-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO HOUSE PER REQUEST |
2017-04-11 | Senate | FN3: INDETERMINATE(GOV/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI |
2017-04-11 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO |
2017-04-11 | Senate | NR: COGHILL, KELLY, MEYER |
2017-04-11 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 1DP 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2017-03-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-24 | House | VERSION: HB 106 |
2017-03-24 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, TARR, JOSEPHSON |
2017-03-24 | House | PASSED Y33 N3 E4 |
2017-03-24 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 106 |
2017-03-24 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-24 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2017 |
2017-03-17 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(GOV/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2017-03-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2017-03-17 | House | NR: WILSON, PRUITT, THOMPSON, TILTON |
2017-03-17 | House | DP: KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-03-17 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 4NR |
2017-03-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI |
2017-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO |
2017-02-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, EDGMON |
2017-02-22 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(GOV/FUND TRANSFERS) |
2017-02-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2017-02-22 | House | NR: REINBOLD |
2017-02-22 | House | DP: KOPP, FANSLER, CLAMAN |
2017-02-22 | House | JUD RPT 3DP 1NR |
2017-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2017-02-06 | House | JUD, FIN |
2017-02-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |