VA HB1319 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-6)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-6)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; CURE CHILDHOOD CANCER. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates for supporters of curing childhood cancer bearing the legend CURE CHILDHOOD CANCER. This bill may be known as "The Mathias Bill." The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Special license plates; CURE CHILDHOOD CANCER.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630) | |
2015-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 3/26/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1319ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101038D-E |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1319E |
2015-02-02 | House | Emergency clause added |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101038D |