CA AB3064 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23630, 23655, 23680, 27560, 27966, 28000, and 30510 of, and to add Sections 23656 and 23658 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 23630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 23656 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 23658 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 23680 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 27966 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 30510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |