US SR536 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7-1)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330; text as passed Senate: CR S5326)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330; text as passed Senate: CR S5326)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates September 2014 as National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month and expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
A resolution designating September 2014 as "National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330; text as passed Senate: CR S5326) |
Same As/Similar To
HR301 (Related) 2013-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR697 (Related) 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR205 (Related) 2013-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082; text as passed Senate: CR S6079-6080)
HR697 (Related) 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR205 (Related) 2013-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082; text as passed Senate: CR S6079-6080)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/536/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres536/BILLS-113sres536ats.pdf |