US HR697 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8-1)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 2014 as National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HR301 (Related) 2013-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR205 (Related) 2013-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082; text as passed Senate: CR S6079-6080)
SR536 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330; text as passed Senate: CR S5326)
SR205 (Related) 2013-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082; text as passed Senate: CR S6079-6080)
SR536 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330; text as passed Senate: CR S5326)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/697/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres697/BILLS-113hres697ih.pdf |