AZ HB2865 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resource conservation districts; board
Title
Natural resource conservation districts; board
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Lupe Diaz [R] | Rep. Tim Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Carter that pursuant to House Rule 12(P) and not withstanding any other Houe Rule, HB2865 be refeerred to an Additional Committee of the Whole immediately for purpose of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Carter that pursuant to House Rule 12(P) and not withstanding any other Houe Rule, HB2865 be refeerred to an Additional Committee of the Whole immediately for purpose of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-22-0-0) |
2024-02-28 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-28 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-12 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1011 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1012 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3032.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6014 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 6055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 2103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 2106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 1335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |