VA HB995 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Medicine; temporary licensure of physicians licensed in a foreign country. Permits the Board of Medicine to issue a provisional license to a physician licensed in a foreign country for no more than two years, then a subsequent renewable two-year license if the physician practices in a medically underserved area. After two years of practice under the renewable license in a medically underserved area, a physician licensed in a foreign country is eligible to apply for a full, unrestricted license to practice medicine. The bill specifies that eligibility for such licenses is conditional upon an applicant demonstrating certain educational and experiential qualifications to the Board and obtaining employment with a medical care facility that provides an assessment and evaluation program for physicians licensed in a foreign country. Board of Medicine; temporary licensure of physicians licensed in a foreign country. Permits the Board of Medicine to issue a provisional license to a physician licensed in a foreign country for no more than two years, then a subsequent renewable two-year license if the physician practices in a medically underserved area. After two years of practice under the renewable license in a medically underserved area, a physician licensed in a foreign country is eligible to apply for a full, unrestricted license to practice medicine. The bill specifies that eligibility for such licenses is conditional upon an applicant demonstrating certain educational and experiential qualifications to the Board and obtaining employment with a medical care facility that provides an assessment and evaluation program for physicians licensed in a foreign country.
Title
Medicine, Board of; temporary licensure of physicians licensed in a foreign country.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB995ER) |
2024-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health Professions |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned sub: Health Professions |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104934D |