IL HB5357 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 5:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 5:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, but changes the provisions to apply when issuing or quoting (rather than issuing or marketing) a homeowner's insurance policy.
Title
INS CD-HOMEOWNER'S INS-SEWER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2024-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |