US SR126 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Thanks teachers for their service. Promotes the teaching profession. Recognizes students, parents, school administrators, and public officials who participate in National Teacher Appreciation Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing the teachers of the United States for their contributions to the development and progress of our country.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3282) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3050) |
Same As/Similar To
HR167 (Related) 2013-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR571 (Related) 2014-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR571 (Related) 2014-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Teaching, teachers, curricula