NE LB829 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to insurance coverage for screening for colorectal cancer
Title
Change provisions relating to insurance coverage for screening for colorectal cancer
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-5-3 (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Legislature - Blood AM2384 adopted (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2108 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Legislature - Blood AM2384 adopted (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2108 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-5-3 |
2024-02-29 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Blood AM2384 adopted |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Blood AM2384 filed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER50 adopted |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER50 filed |
2024-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER50 |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2108 adopted |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2108 filed |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2108 |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Jacobson name added |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Blood priority bill |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Ibach name added |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |