CA AB2146 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 108670) to Chapter 5 of Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to product safety.
Title
Product safety: wearable personal flotation devices: infants and children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 108670 | New Code | See Bill Text |