US HR571 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-16)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Thanks and promotes the teaching profession by encouraging students, parents, school administrators, and public officials to participate in teacher appreciation events during National Teacher Day.
Title
Recognizing the roles and contributions of America's teachers to building and enhancing the Nation's civic, cultural, and economic well-being.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR167 (Related) 2013-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR126 (Related) 2013-05-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR440 (Related) 2014-05-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2888; text as passed Senate: CR S2878)
SR126 (Related) 2013-05-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR440 (Related) 2014-05-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2888; text as passed Senate: CR S2878)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/571/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres571/BILLS-113hres571ih.pdf |