US SB1085 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Tax Certainty and Growth Act of 2013 - Expresses the sense of the Senate that Congress should undertake comprehensive tax reform to make the tax system fairer and simpler and to promote economic growth. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) make permanent the increased tax deductions for business start-up expenditures, organizational expenditures, and organization and syndication fees; (2) allow the cash accounting method for businesses whose gross receipts do not exceed $10 million (currently, $5 million); (3) exempt businesses whose gross receipts do not exceed $10 million from the requirement to use inventories; (4) make permanent the $250,000 allowance for expensing business assets, including computer software; (5) extend for one year the additional depreciation allowance for business assets; and (6) extend through 2014 the 15-year straight-line depreciation allowance for qualified leasehold, restaurant, and retail improvements.
Title
Small Business Tax Certainty and Growth Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3908) |
Same As/Similar To
HB947 (Related) 2013-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3948 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4019 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1498 (Related) 2013-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1737 (Related) 2014-04-02 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2043)
SB1858 (Related) 2013-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2223 (Related) 2014-04-30 - Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote No. 117) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S2527-2528, S2535-2543, S2543-2546, S2546-2547, S2548-2549)
HB3948 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4019 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1498 (Related) 2013-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1737 (Related) 2014-04-02 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2043)
SB1858 (Related) 2013-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2223 (Related) 2014-04-30 - Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote No. 117) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S2527-2528, S2535-2543, S2543-2546, S2546-2547, S2548-2549)
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Business investment and capital
Contracts and agency
Corporate finance and management
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Food industry and services
Income tax deductions
Inflation and prices
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax reform and tax simplification
Business investment and capital
Contracts and agency
Corporate finance and management
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic performance and conditions
Food industry and services
Income tax deductions
Inflation and prices
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax reform and tax simplification
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1085/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1085/BILLS-113s1085is.pdf |