CA AB2865 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51203 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: excessive alcohol use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |