US SB1498 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Tax Fairness Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2014: (1) the 100% exclusion from gross income of gain from the sale of certain small business stock; (2) the increased amount of the tax deduction for business start-up expenses; (3) the reductions of the recognition period for built-in gains of S corporations; and (4) the increased expensing allowance for tangible business assets, including computer software, and real property. Allows a deduction in 2013 for health insurance costs in computing self-employment taxable income.
Title
Small Business Tax Fairness Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4019 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1085 (Related) 2013-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1737 (Related) 2014-04-02 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2043)
SB1859 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 287.
SB2223 (Same As) 2014-04-30 - Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote No. 117) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S2527-2528, S2535-2543, S2543-2546, S2546-2547, S2548-2549)
SB1085 (Related) 2013-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1737 (Related) 2014-04-02 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S2043)
SB1859 (Related) 2013-12-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 287.
SB2223 (Same As) 2014-04-30 - Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote No. 117) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S2527-2528, S2535-2543, S2543-2546, S2546-2547, S2548-2549)
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Capital gains tax
Computers and information technology
Food industry and services
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Retail and wholesale trades
Securities
Self-employed
Small business
Taxation
Capital gains tax
Computers and information technology
Food industry and services
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Retail and wholesale trades
Securities
Self-employed
Small business
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1498/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1498/BILLS-113s1498is.pdf |