NY S07096 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to the adoption of instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of AEDs in senior high schools.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to the adoption of instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of AEDs in senior high schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.417 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9298 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1351 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09298 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7096