NY A09298 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-10)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7096
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7096
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to the adoption of instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of AEDs in senior high schools.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to the adoption of instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and the use of AEDs in senior high schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s7096 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.295 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07096 (Same As) 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.417