NY S06182 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Wheatfield's building inspector to reside outside of the town.
Title
Authorizes Wheatfield's building inspector to reside outside of the town.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8404 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-01-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.44 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08404 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - signed chap.102