NY A08404 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Wheatfield's building inspector to reside outside of the town.
Title
Authorizes Wheatfield's building inspector to reside outside of the town.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] | Asm. John Ceretto [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.102 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-04-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-04-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.44 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6182 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.458 |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06182 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8404