MN SF3944 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3436, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3436, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Transportation policy bill
Title
Omnibus Transportation policy bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3436, SF indefinitely postponed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Author added Morrison |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3436 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Senate conferees Dibble; Morrison; Jasinski