MN HF3436 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation; various policies modified, including but not limited to motor vehicles, driving rules, accident reporting requirements, child passenger restraint requirements, roadable aircraft, legislative routes, drivers' licenses and exams, excavation notices, and greater Minnesota transit; criminal penalties modified; prior appropriations modified; technical changes made; and reports required.
Title
Transportation; various policies modified, including but not limited to motor vehicles, driving rules, accident reporting requirements, child passenger restraint requirements, roadable aircraft, legislative routes, drivers' licenses and exams, excavation notices, and greater Minnesota transit; criminal penalties modified; prior appropriations modified; technical changes made; and reports required.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Tabke [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3436 (Y: 97 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 97 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: "Shall the decision of Speaker pro tempore Her stand as the judgment of the House? (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Koznick - Amendment - H3436A31 (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Robbins - Amendment - H3436A44 (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment H3436A42 - H3436A42 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: 67 - Amendment as amended - Nays (Y: 63 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment - H3436A33 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment - H3436A37 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Niska - Amendment - H3436A35 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Fogelman - Amendment - H3436A32 (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-07 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3436 (Y: 97 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 97 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: "Shall the decision of Speaker pro tempore Her stand as the judgment of the House? (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Koznick - Amendment - H3436A31 (Y: 58 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Robbins - Amendment - H3436A44 (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Neu Brindley - Amendment H3436A42 - H3436A42 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: 67 - Amendment as amended - Nays (Y: 63 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment - H3436A33 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Petersburg - Amendment - H3436A37 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Niska - Amendment - H3436A35 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Fogelman - Amendment - H3436A32 (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 104 | |
2024-05-15 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-05-15 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-05-15 | Governor approval | |
2024-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Third reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2024-05-09 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2024-05-09 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2024-05-07 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2024-05-07 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2024-05-07 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2024-05-07 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees Dibble; Morrison; Jasinski |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | House conferees Tabke; Hornstein; Petersburg |
2024-04-15 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-04-15 | House | Senate conferees Dibble; Morrison; Jasinski |
2024-04-15 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2024-04-11 | House | House conferees Tabke, Hornstein, Petersburg |
2024-04-11 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF3944 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3944, now on General Orders |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-04 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Third reading as amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2024-04-04 | House | Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 4, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-26 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Transportation Finance and Policy |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3944 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3436, SF indefinitely postponed