MA S32 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-04 - Accompanied H125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-04 - Accompanied H125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to strengthening early support and education . Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to strengthening early support and education
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] | Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Martin Walsh [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-04 | House | Accompanied H125 |
2013-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H125 (Replaced by) 2014-12-18 - New draft substituted, see H4556
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S32 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S32.pdf |