NY S09138 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the interagency elder justice task force consisting of representatives of state agencies whose work involves elder justice to create greater collaboration and develop overarching strategies, systems, and programs with a goal of protecting older adults from abuse and mistreatment.
Title
Establishes the interagency elder justice task force consisting of representatives of state agencies whose work involves elder justice to create greater collaboration and develop overarching strategies, systems, and programs with a goal of protecting older adults from abuse and mistreatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1063 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |