AK HB104 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to salvage sales of timber, negotiated timber sales for local manufacture of wood products, and expedited timber sales; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Timber Sale: Expedited/salvage/negotiated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 11 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 4 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Rescind Previous Action in adopting Amendment No. 3 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 11 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 4 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Rescind Previous Action in adopting Amendment No. 3 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-04-24 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | AM: KAWASAKI |
2024-04-24 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, KAUFMAN |
2024-04-24 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GIESSEL, CLAMAN, DUNBAR |
2024-04-24 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 14 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 4DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2024-01-29 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN |
2023-04-24 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MERRICK, SHOWER, STEDMAN |
2023-04-21 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN |
2023-04-21 | Senate | RES |
2023-04-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-04-20 | House | VERSION: CSHB 104(RES) AM |
2023-04-20 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2023-04-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-04-20 | House | PASSED Y32 N5 E3 |
2023-04-20 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 104(RES) AM |
2023-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, VANCE, D.JOHNSON, RUFFRIDGE |
2023-04-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CALENDAR |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 11 FAILED Y14 N24 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 10 FAILED Y4 N34 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 9 FAILED Y11 N27 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 8 FAILED Y13 N25 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 7 FAILED Y13 N25 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 6 NOT OFFERED |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 5 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y14 N24 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 3 AS AMD ADOPTED Y36 N2 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM 2 TO AM 3 ADOPTED UC |
2023-04-19 | House | AM 1 TO AM 3 WITHDRAWN |
2023-04-19 | House | RESCIND ACTION (ADOPTED) AM 1 TO AM 3 UC |
2023-04-19 | House | AM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y38 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | RESCIND ACTION (ADOPTED) AM 3 PASSED Y34 N4 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y21 N17 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED |
2023-04-19 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N24 E2 |
2023-04-19 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-04-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-04-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI |
2023-04-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2023-04-17 | House | NR: ARMSTRONG, PATKOTAK |
2023-04-17 | House | DP: RAUSCHER, MCCABE, SADDLER, MCKAY |
2023-04-17 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR |
2023-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SUMNER |
2023-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY |
2023-03-08 | House | RES |
2023-03-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |