MA H125 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S32
Note: Legislation replaced by H4556
Note: Legislation replaced by H4556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - New draft substituted, see H4556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-18 - New draft substituted, see H4556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a home visiting program to provide culturally sensitive services to eligible parents, infants and children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Strengthening early support and education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | House | New draft substituted, see H4556 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read second, amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2014-12-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2014-12-18 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-12-18 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4556 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-14 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-11-04 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-11-04 | House | Accompanied by S32 |
2013-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S32 (Replaces) 2013-11-04 - Accompanied H125
H4556 (Replaced by) 2014-12-18 - Ordered to a third reading
H4556 (Replaced by) 2014-12-18 - Ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H125 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H125.pdf |