FL H7071 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates ARNPs as advanced registered practice nurses (APRNs); provides for independent APRNs (IAPRNs) to practice advanced or specialized nursing; exempts IAPRNs from requirement that certain medical acts be supervised by physician; revises APRN certification requirements; authorizes APRNs to administer, dispense, & prescribe medicinal drugs pursuant to protocol; provides for registration of IAPRNs who meet certain requirements; specifies acts that IAPRNs are authorized to perform without physician supervision or protocol; provides for eligibility of IAPRNs for clinical privileges; requires IAPRNs to maintain medical malpractice insurance or provide proof of financial responsibility.
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Sponsors
House Select Committee On Health Care Workforce Innovation | Rep. Cary Pigman [R] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] |
Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] | Rep. John Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1352 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
H7113 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 323 (Ch. 2014-113)
H7113 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 323 (Ch. 2014-113)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00593 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 427 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 0475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 357 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/7071 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/7071/BillText/Filed/PDF |