FL S1352 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding who may prescribe brand drugs under the prescription drug program when medically necessary; excepting controlled substances prescribed by an advanced practice registered nurse from the disqualifications for continued certification or licensure as a deputy or state pilot; authorizing an advanced practice registered nurse to prescribe, dispense, administer, or order drugs in accordance with a specified formulary, if such formulary is established; requiring the Board of Nursing to appoint a committee to determine whether such a formulary is needed and specifying the membership of the committee, etc.
Title
Health Care Practitioners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 4 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0819 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
S1066 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
H7071 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
H7113 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 323 (Ch. 2014-113)
S1066 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 97 (Ch. 2014-108)
H7071 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
H7113 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 323 (Ch. 2014-113)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00593 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4574 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 427 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 0475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 357 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |