WV SB440 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the Commissioner of Highways to utilize the spending authority of the State Road Fund to pay current obligations by moving spending authority within the fund for a fiscal year. This would give the DOH the same or similar ability to transfer spending authority that other Special Revenue agencies have. When the agency forecasts what funding it will need two years out, the estimates for each appropriation line are not exact. DOH may predict it will need $1 million dollars in maintenance, but halfway through the fiscal year, the need in maintenance may be greater than anticipated. Under this legislation, spending authority can be moved to maintenance from any other appropriation which had been allocated more than will be utilized that fiscal year. The Legislature would approve the overall allocation for the State Road Fund through the annual budget bill and the Division would report the transfers to the Governor and the Legislature.
Title
Authorizing DOH pay current obligations from State Road Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 312) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | To House Finance |
2023-03-01 | House | To Finance |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 312) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2023-02-15 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |