CO HB1057 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting the use of an algorithmic device by a landlord for the purpose of determining the amount of rent to charge a residential tenant, and, in connection therewith, declaring that such use is an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the "Colorado Consumer Protection Act".
Title
Prohibit Algorithmic Devices Used for Rent Setting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1057, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1057 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1057, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/22/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/18/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2024-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-02-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-01-31 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |