WV SB416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tentative appraisals of natural resources property
Title
Relating to tentative appraisals of natural resources property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 251) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 251) |
2014-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-19 | House | To House Finance |
2014-02-19 | House | To Finance |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2014-01-22 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-22 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4470 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 6K | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 6K | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |