WV SB312 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to set a deadline by which candidates or their financial agents must file financial statements in order to avoid being disqualified as a nominee for the general election.
Title
Relating to disqualification of general election nominees for failure to file campaign finance statements
Sponsors
Sen. David Nohe [R] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Kent Leonhardt [R] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] |
Sen. Daniel Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 625) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 536) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 535) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 536) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 535) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 625) |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 5) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 536) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 535) |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 8 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |