WV SB299 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 212, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 212, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify that duty-related disability payments in State Police (Plan B) begins the first day of the month following CPRB approval and member termination of employment.
Title
Clarifying start date of State Police duty-related and nonduty related disability payments
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 1) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 127) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 126) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 127) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 126) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 212, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-05 | House | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/3/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-02-27 | Senate | To Governor 2/27/15 |
2015-02-23 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 1) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 127) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 126) |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | To Finance |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 3) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-12 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-11 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2015-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-01-26 | Senate | To Pensions then Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2506 (Same As) 2015-02-06 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |