WV HB4588 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to protect unborn children who are capable of experiencing pain by prohibiting abortion after twenty weeks post-fertilization except when the mother has a medical emergency. The bill provides for civil and criminal remedies. This article is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Protecting unborn children who are capable of experiencing pain by prohibiting abortion after twenty weeks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 481) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 164) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 163) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 164) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 165) (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 163) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-28 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 481) |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Judiciary Title amendment adopted |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Health Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 17) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Reordered on calendar |
2014-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Judiciary Committee Amendment Reported |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Health Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/4/14 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-26 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 165) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-25 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 164) |
2014-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 163) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-17 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-17 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2014-02-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB388 (Similar To) 2014-01-21 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2M | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 2M | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |