WV HB4488 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to eliminate the notarization requirement for articles of incorporation of cooperative associations, to make it consistent with other business organization’s filing procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating the requirement for notarization of the articles of incorporation for cooperative associations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Passed Senate (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Passed House (Roll No. 142) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10HouseChapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
2014-03-21HouseApproved by Governor 3/21/14
2014-03-14HouseApproved by Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14SenateApproved by Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-14HouseTo Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal
2014-03-17HouseTo Governor 3/17/14
2014-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2014-03-05SenateCommunicated to House
2014-03-05SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 13)
2014-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2014-03-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2014-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2014-03-04SenateOn 2nd reading
2014-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2014-03-03SenateOn 1st reading
2014-02-28SenateReported do pass
2014-02-25SenateTo Judiciary
2014-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-02-25SenateHouse Message received
2014-02-24HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-02-24HousePassed House (Roll No. 142)
2014-02-24HouseRead 3rd time
2014-02-24HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-21HouseRead 2nd time
2014-02-21HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-20HouseRead 1st time
2014-02-20HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-19HouseDo pass
2014-02-12HouseTo House Judiciary
2014-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2014-02-12HouseTo Judiciary
2014-02-12HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1946Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback