HI SCR61 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Adopt Administrative Rules To Enable Credit Enhancement For Construction Loans Under Any Funds Administered By The Corporation.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Adopt Administrative Rules To Enable Credit Enhancement For Construction Loans Under Any Funds Administered By The Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 04-10-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to HSG, referral sheet 26 |
2024-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 349) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-24. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3392) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WAM. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR85 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SR50 (Same As) 2024-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
SR50 (Same As) 2024-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).