DE SB289 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends Title 16, Chapter 76 of the Delaware Code relating to energy conservation identified in county and municipal building and plumbing codes. Consistent with codes in other States, including New York, Rhode Island, and Washington, among others, this Act requires as a threshold that counties and municipalities must, at minimum, meet the threshold adopted by the Delaware Energy Office (DEO). The Act authorizes counties and municipalities to go above the threshold adopted by the DEO.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Energy Conservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-05-23 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 289 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-05-22 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 289 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |