WI SB291 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 238.137 of the statutes; relating to: authorizing the sale or transfer of tax credits in counties experiencing high rates of unemployment. (FE)
Title
Authorizing the sale or transfer of tax credits in counties experiencing high rates of unemployment. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 3 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-06 | Senate | LRB correction |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-12-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-11-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb291 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB291.pdf |