WI SB206 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Published 7-21-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Published 7-21-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.923 (4) (g) 1m.; and to amend 20.923 (7), 20.923 (8), 20.923 (9), 20.923 (15) (b), 40.05 (4) (ag) 1., 230.12 (3) (e) (title), 230.12 (3) (e) 2. and 230.26 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: statutory salaries and state civil service. (FE)
Title
Statutory salaries and state civil service. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-08 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | Senate | Published 7-21-2015 |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-20-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 58 |
2015-07-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 7-17-2015 |
2015-07-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-07-08 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-07-08 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 64, Noes 30 |
2015-07-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-07-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-08 | House | Read a second time |
2015-07-08 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 7-8-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 (4) |
2015-07-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Passed, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 7-7-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Introduced |