WI AB422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 563.03 (12m); to renumber and amend 563.90; to amend 563.05 (2), 563.91, 563.92 (1m), 563.92 (2), 563.93 (1) (e), 563.93 (1s), 563.93 (4) (a), 563.93 (4) (b), 563.93 (4m), 563.93 (5), 563.93 (6), 563.93 (7), 563.93 (8), 563.93 (9), 563.935 (5), 563.935 (6) (a), 563.935 (6) (b), 563.935 (8), 563.935 (9), 563.935 (10) (intro.) and 945.01 (3) (b) 1.; and to create 563.908, 563.92 (3b) and 563.98 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: raffles that involve the racing of plastic or rubber ducks. (FE)
Title
Raffles that involve the racing of plastic or rubber ducks. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] |
Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] |
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Mary Williams [R] |
Rep. Michael Endsley [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Joe Leibham [R] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] |
Sen. Dale Schultz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 273 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-01-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque |
2013-11-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2013-10-17 | House | Introduced |