WI AB420 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 118.40 (2r) (f), 118.40 (2r) (fm) 2., 118.40 (2r) (g) 1. c. to dn. and 121.07 (2) (e); and to amend 118.40 (2r) (e) 2p. (intro.), 118.40 (2r) (fm) 1. (intro.), 118.40 (2r) (g) 1. a., 118.40 (2r) (g) 1. bf., 118.40 (2r) (g) 1. e., 121.07 (2) (d) and 121.07 (2) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: payments to an independent charter school authorized by a tribal college. (FE)
Title
Payments to an independent charter school authorized by a tribal college. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 219 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a second time |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-09-22 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-29 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-06-28 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2021-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced |