WI AB374 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 108.02 (26m) and 108.04 (3); and to amend 108.04 (11) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: deletion of the waiting period for collection of unemployment insurance benefits. (FE)
Title
Deletion of the waiting period for collection of unemployment insurance benefits. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Labor and take up (Y: 39 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Labor and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 59 |
2013-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2013-09-17 | House | Introduced |