WA SB5885 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning procedures for certificates of annexation submitted to the office of financial management.
Title
Concerning procedures for certificates of annexation submitted to the office of financial management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Chapter 30, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-16 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 13 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35a | 14 | 700 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |