WA SB5310 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a senior center license.
Title
Creating a senior center license.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Nick Harper [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 78, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | OVER - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-20 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.