WA HB1063 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a senior center license.
Title
Creating a senior center license.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-02-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-05 | House | OVER - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-05 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight. |
2013-01-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5310 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.