WA HB1396 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Incentivizing the use of alternative fuel commercial use vehicles with tax preferences.
Title
Incentivizing the use of alternative fuel commercial use vehicles with tax preferences.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-14 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 6:00 PM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB5325 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.