WA HB1238 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing motorcycles to stop and proceed through traffic control signals under certain conditions.
Title
Allowing motorcycles to stop and proceed through traffic control signals under certain conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-14 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-14 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2013-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5141 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.