WA HB1042 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that the physical therapist scope of practice does not include dry needling.
Title
Clarifying that the physical therapist scope of practice does not include dry needling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2015-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-01-30 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-30 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 11:00 AM. |
2015-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2014-12-10 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |