VT S0246 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Action Calendar: Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Action Calendar: Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to amending the Vermont basic needs budget and livable wage
Title
An act relating to amending the Vermont basic needs budget and livable wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-05-03 | House | Rep. Burrows of West Windsor reported for the Committee on General and Housing |
2024-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-05-02 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |