VT S0245 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Requiring Cardiovascular Care Instruction In Public And Independent Schools
Title
An Act Relating To Requiring Cardiovascular Care Instruction In Public And Independent Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Ayer [D] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] | Sen. Sara Kittell [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] |
Sen. Richard McCormack [D] | Sen. Hinda Miller [D] | Sen. Kevin Mullin [R] | Sen. Richard Westman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to Governor on May 11, 2012 | |
2012-05-04 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Baruth for Committee, text | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-04 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Doyle, Lyons, and Baruth | |
2012-04-28 | On motion of Senator Mullin, the Senate refused to concur in House proposal of amendment and requested a conference committee | |
2012-04-28 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Speaker appointed Donovan of Burlington, Christie of Hartford and Campion of Bennington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-23 | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-21 | House Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-21 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-20 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-04-18 | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment | |
2012-04-18 | Amendment of Rep. Donahue of Northfield as substituted agreed to | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-17 | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Education agreed to | |
2012-04-13 | Rep. Rep. Christie of Hartford reported for the committee on Education | |
2012-04-17 | Read Second Time | |
2012-02-21 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education | |
2012-02-16 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2012-02-16 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-02-14 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-02-14 | Motion to amend Education Committee recommendation of amendment offered by Senator Baruth on behalf of the Committee on Education agreed to | |
2012-02-14 | Pending Question: Shall the recommendation of amemdment of the Committee on Education be amended as moved by Senator Baruth? | |
2012-02-09 | Called up by Senator Mullin & placed on action calendar for February 14, 2012 | |
2012-02-02 | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Mazza on division Yeas 19, Nays 4 | |
2012-02-02 | Recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth on behalf of Committee on Education | |
2012-02-02 | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Education with recommendation of amendment | |
2012-02-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-02 | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth on behalf of the Committee on Education | |
2012-02-02 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEducation | |
2012-01-31 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-03 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |