VT S0055 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to authorizing public bodies to meet electronically under Vermont’s Open Meeting Law
Title
An act relating to authorizing public bodies to meet electronically under Vermont’s Open Meeting Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-03 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by Senator Hardy and Westman |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Hardy and Westman |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Hardy and Westman |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |